Docket for 17-6180 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Sep 25 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 30, 2017) | | | Oct 30 2017 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | | Nov 01 2017 | Reply of petitioner James Hitchcock filed. | | | Nov 03 2017 | Letter of November 1, 2017, from counsel for petitioner waiving 14-day waiting period for the filing of a reply brief received. | | | Nov 09 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017. | | | Dec 04 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|