Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5861 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5861 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:William Thomas Zeigler, Jr., Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:September 7, 2017
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC16-1498)
   Decision Date:April 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:June 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Sep 05 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due October 10, 2017)
Oct 10 2017Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed.
Oct 23 2017Reply of petitioner William Thomas Zeigler filed. (Distributed)
Oct 25 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 13 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dennis H. Tracey
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US LLP
875 Third Avenue
New York, NY 07054

dennis.tracey@hoganlovells.com
(212) 909-0646
Party name: William Thomas Zeigler
Attorneys for Respondent
Vivian Ann Singleton
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
444 Seabreeze Boulevard, 5th Floor
Daytona Beach, FL 32118

capapp@myfloridalegal.com
386-238-4990
Party name: Florida

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543