Docket for 17-5707
|
May 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 22, 2017) | | | Oct 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|