Docket for 17-5667
|
May 24 2017 | Application (16A1179) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 1, 2017 to July 31, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas. | | | Jun 02 2017 | Application (16A1179) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until July 31, 2017. | | | Jun 02 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due September 20, 2017) | | | Oct 05 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | | Nov 13 2017 | Petition for Rehearing filed. | | Main DocumentProof of Service | Nov 29 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Rehearing DENIED. | | |
|