Docket for 17-562
|
Oct 11 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 13, 2017) | | | Nov 09 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 13, 2017. | | | Dec 13 2017 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | Proof of ServiceMain Document | Dec 22 2017 | Reply of petitioner Sheldon Silver filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Jan 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|