Docket for 17-5300 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jun 02 2017 | Application (16A1220) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 20, 2017 to July 20, 2017, submitted to Justice Kennedy. | | | Jun 15 2017 | Application (16A1220) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until July 20, 2017. | | | Jul 20 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 23, 2017) | | | Aug 16 2017 | Brief of respondent Warden Davis in opposition filed. | | | Aug 22 2017 | Reply of petitioner Reynaldo M.Ayala filed. | | | Aug 31 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|