Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-515
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-515
Title:CNH Industrial N.V., et al., Petitioners
v.
Jack Reese, et al.
Docketed:October 5, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-2382)
   Decision Date:April 20, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:August 28, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Oct 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 6, 2017)
Oct 23 2017Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, CNH Industrial N.V., et al.
Oct 23 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017.
Nov 06 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Whirlpool Corporation.
Nov 06 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Nov 06 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Erisa Industry Committee.
Nov 20 2017Brief of respondents Jack Reese, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 01 2017Reply of petitioners CNH Industrial N.V., et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Dec 06 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018.
Jan 04 2018Rescheduled.
Jan 08 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018.
Jan 16 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/19/2018.
Feb 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018.
Feb 20 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Erisa Industry Committee GRANTED.
Feb 20 2018Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Whirlpool Corporation GRANTED.
Feb 20 2018Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. GRANTED.
Feb 20 2018Petition GRANTED. Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Opinion per curiam. (Detached Opinion)
Mar 26 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Bobby Burchfield
    Counsel of Record
King & Spalding LLP
1700 Pennsylvania Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20006

bburchfield@kslaw.com
(202) 626-5524
Party name: CNH Industrial N.V., et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Darcie R. Brault
    Counsel of Record
McKnight, Canzano, Smith, Radtke & Brault
423 N. Main Street, Sutie 200
Royal Oak, MI 48067

dbrault@michworkerlaw.com
(248) 354-9650
Party name: Jack Reese, et al.
Other
Kenneth Winn Allen
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis, LLP
655 15th Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

winn.allen@kirkland.com
202-879-5000
Party name: Erisa Industry Committee
Glen D. Nager
    Counsel of Record
Jones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20001-2113

gdnager@jonesday.com
202-879-5464
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Stephen Shapiro
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown, LLP
71 South Wacker Drive
Chicago, IL 60606

sshapiro@mayerbrown.com
(312) 782-0600
Party name: Whirlpool Corporation

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543