Docket for 17-5120 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
|
Jul 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 14, 2017) | | | Aug 10 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 13, 2017. | | | Sep 13 2017 | Brief of respondent Warden White in opposition filed. | | | Sep 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. | | | Oct 03 2017 | Reply of petitioner Roger L. Wheeler filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 16 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|