Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-5080 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-5080 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Thomas Bartlett Whitaker, Petitioner
v.
Lorie Davis, Director, Texas Department of Criminal Justice, Correctional Institutions Division
Docketed:July 6, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-70013)
   Decision Date:April 4, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jul 03 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due August 7, 2017)
Aug 15 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017.
Sep 05 2017Brief of respondent Davis, Dir., TX DCJ in opposition filed.
Sep 21 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017.
Oct 10 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Philip Harlan Hilder
    Counsel of Record
Hilder & Associates, P.C.
819 Lovett Boulevard
Houston, TX 77006-3905

(713) 655-9111
Party name: Thomas Bartlett Whitaker
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Hamilton Frederick
    Counsel of Record
Deputy Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711-2548

matthew.frederick@oag.texas.gov
(512) 936-6407
Party name: Davis, Dir., TX DCJ

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543