Docket for 17-47
|
Jul 05 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 7, 2017) | | | Jul 25 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 6, 2017, for all respondents. | | | Sep 06 2017 | Brief of respondent Ferguson Enterprises, Inc. in opposition filed. | | | Sep 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|