Docket for 17-412
|
Sep 13 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 19, 2017) | | | Sep 20 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Microsemi Corp. to respond filed. | | | Sep 20 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent White Electronic Designs Corp. to respond filed. | | | Oct 04 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|