Docket for 17-351
|
Sep 05 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 10, 2017) | | | Sep 14 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents FCC, et al. to respond filed. | | | Sep 19 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Douglas P. Walburg and Richie Enterprise, LLC to respond filed. | | | Sep 20 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent TechHealth, Inc. to respond filed. | | | Sep 21 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Anda, Inc. to respond filed. | | | Sep 25 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent ZocDoc, Inc. to respond filed. | | | Sep 26 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Merck & Company, Inc. to respond filed. | | | Sep 26 2017 | Waiver of right of respondents Staples, Inc; Quill Corp. to respond filed. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent McKesson Corp. to respond filed. | | | Oct 24 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017. | | | Oct 31 2017 | Response Requested. (Due November 30, 2017) | | | Nov 21 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from November 30, 2017 to January 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Nov 22 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including January 2, 2018, for all respondents. | | | Dec 18 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from January 2, 2018 to January 16, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. | | Main Document | Dec 19 2017 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is further extended to and including January 16, 2018, for all respondents. | | | Jan 16 2018 | Brief of Federal Respondents in opposition filed. | | Certificate of Word CountMain Document | Jan 16 2018 | Brief of Private Respondents Anda, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Jan 30 2018 | Reply of petitioners Bais Yaakov of Spring Valley, et al. filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count | Jan 31 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/16/2018. | | | Feb 20 2018 | Petition DENIED. Justice Alito took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|