Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-344
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-344
Title:Edward Lewis Tobinick, et al., Petitioners
v.
Steven Novella, et al.
Docketed:September 6, 2017
Linked with 16A1103
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-14889)
   Decision Date:February 15, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:April 6, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 09 2017Application (16A1103) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 5, 2017 to September 3, 2017, submitted to Justice Thomas.
May 16 2017Application (16A1103) granted by Justice Thomas extending the time to file until September 3, 2017.
Sep 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 6, 2017)
Oct 06 2017Brief of respondent Steven Novella in opposition filed.
Oct 06 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Stephen J. Ralph.
Oct 16 2017Respondent's response in opposition to motion for leave to file amicus brief by Stephen J. Ralph from filed.
Oct 18 2017Reply of petitioners Edward L. Tobinick, et al. filed.
Oct 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/9/2017.
Nov 06 2017Supplemental brief of petitioners Edward L. Tobinick, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Nov 13 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Stephen J. Ralph GRANTED.
Nov 13 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Cullin A. O'Brien
    Counsel of Record
Cullen O'Brien Law, PA
6541 NE 21st Way
Suite 500
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33308

cullin@cullinobrienlaw.com
(561) 676-6370
Party name: Edward L. Tobinick, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Marc John Randazza
    Counsel of Record
Randazza Legal Group
4035 S. El Capitan Way
Las Vegas, NV 89147

ecf@randazza.com
702-420-2001
Party name: Steven Novella
Other
William Benjamin DeClercq
    Counsel of Record
DeClercq Law Group, Inc.
225 South Lake Avenue, Suite 300
Pasadena, CA 91101

William@DeClercqLaw.com
626-408-2150
Party name: Stephen J. Ralph

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543