Docket for 17-321
|
Jun 16 2017 | Application (16A1249) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from July 6, 2017 to September 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Kagan. | | | Jun 21 2017 | Application (16A1249) granted by Justice Kagan extending the time to file until September 4, 2017. | | | Aug 28 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 2, 2017) | | | Sep 22 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Tennessee to respond filed. | | | Oct 04 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Response Requested. (Due November 9, 2017) | | | Oct 25 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 11, 2017. | | | Dec 11 2017 | Brief of respondent Tennessee in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 27 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/12/2018. | | | Jan 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|