Docket for 17-299
|
Aug 23 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 25, 2017) | | | Aug 31 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Charles Kleinert to respond filed. | | | Sep 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Sep 20 2017 | Response Requested. (Due October 20, 2017) | | | Sep 25 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Constitutional Law, Criminal Law, and Federal Courts Scholars filed. | | | Sep 29 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 20, 2017. | | | Oct 20 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Texas State Conference of the NAACP filed. | | | Nov 16 2017 | Brief of respondent Charles Kleinert in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 04 2017 | Reply of petitioner Texas filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|