Docket for 17-195
|
Apr 28 2017 | Application (16A1063) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 5, 2017 to August 4, 2017, submitted to Justice Sotomayor. | | | May 08 2017 | Application (16A1063) granted by Justice Sotomayor extending the time to file until August 4, 2017. | | | Aug 04 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 5, 2017) | | | Aug 29 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Freedom of Conscience Defense Fund, et al. filed. | | | Aug 31 2017 | Brief amici curiae of Christian Legal Society, et al. filed. | | | Aug 31 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Wy Comm. on Judicial Conduct and Ethics to respond filed. | | | Sep 01 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Foundation for Moral Law filed. | | | Sep 05 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Sutherland Institute filed. | | | Sep 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Sep 14 2017 | Response Requested. (Due October 16, 2017) | | | Oct 10 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 15, 2017. | | | Nov 09 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 6, 2017. | | | Dec 06 2017 | Brief of respondent Wyoming Commission on Judicial Conduct and Ethics in opposition filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 19 2017 | Reply of petitioner Judge Ruth Neely filed. | | Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Dec 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/5/2018. | | | Jan 08 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|