Docket for 17-172
|
Jul 31 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due September 1, 2017) | | | Sep 01 2017 | Brief of respondent Paul Rasband in opposition filed. | | | Sep 01 2017 | Brief of respondents American Dawn, Inc., et al. in opposition filed. | | | Sep 19 2017 | Reply of petitioner Andrew Feldman filed. | | | Sep 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|