SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1707
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1707
Title:
Nichia Corporation, et al., Petitioners
v.
Everlight Electronics Co., Ltd., et al.
Docketed:
June 26, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit
Case Numbers:
(2016-1577, 2016-1611)
Decision Date:
January 4, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
March 23, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Jun 21 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 26, 2018)
Petition
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Jul 10 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 26, 2018 to August 27, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 11 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 27, 2018.
Jul 26 2018
Brief amicus curiae of FUJIFILM Holdings Corporation (Fuji) filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Aug 21 2018
Brief of respondents Everlight Electronics Co., Ltd., et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Sep 05 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 06 2018
Reply of petitioners Nichia Corporation, et al. filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Oct 01 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Mark A. Lemley
Counsel of Record
Durie Tangri LLP
217 Leidesdorff Street
San Francisco, CA 94111
mlemley@durietangri.com
415-362-6666
Party name: Nichia Corporation, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
William Balden Adams
Counsel of Record
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
51 Madison Ave.
22nd Floor
New York, NY 10010
williamadams@quinnemanuel.com
2128497000
Party name: Everlight Electronics Co., Ltd., et al.
Other
Stephen Blake Kinnaird
Counsel of Record
Paul Hastings LLP
875 15th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005
stephenkinnaird@paulhastings.com
202-551-1842
Party name: FUJIFILM Holdings Corporation (Fuji)
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##