Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1678
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1678
Title:Jesus C. Hernández, et al., Petitioners
v.
Jesus Mesa, Jr.
Docketed:June 20, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(12-50217)
   Decision Date:March 20, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 20, 2018 to August 4, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Government of the United Mexican States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 20 2018Brief amicus curiae of Professor Gregory C. Sisk filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 23 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 6, 2018.
Aug 06 2018Response to petition from respondent Jesus Mesa, Jr. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 17 2018Reply of petitioner Jesus C. Hernández, et al. filed. VIDED.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Oct 01 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Apr 11 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Apr 17 2019Supplemental brief of petitioners Jesus C. Hernández, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/16/2019.
May 20 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/23/2019.
May 28 2019Petition GRANTED limited to Question 1 presented by the petition.
May 29 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 06 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file petitioners' brief on the merits is extended to and including August 2, 2019. The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 23, 2019.
Jun 06 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners Jesus C. Hernández, et al.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 24 2019Motion to dispense with printing the joint appendix filed by petitioners GRANTED.
Jul 08 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, November 12, 2019.
Jul 15 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioners, Jesus C. Hernández, et al.
Blanket Consent
Jul 29 2019Blanket Consent filed by Respondent, Jesus Mesa, Jr.
Blanket Consent
Aug 02 2019Brief of petitioners Jesus C. Hernández, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountCertificate of Word Count
Aug 02 2019Brief amicus curiae of Alan Mygatt-Tauber filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Border Scholars filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 08 2019Brief amici curiae of Amnesty International USA, et al. filed.
Main DocumentMain DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Government of the United Mexican States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Constitutional Accountability Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Immigrant and Civil Rights Organizations filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Professor Gregory C. Sisk filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Tahirih Justice Center, et al. filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Aug 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Brady filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Carlos M. Vazquez and Anya Bernstein filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Border Network for Human Rights, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amicus curiae of Institute for Justice filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amici curiae of American Civil Liberties Union, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Douglas Laycock, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Council on American-Islamic Relations and Anas Elhady in support of neither party filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 09 2019Brief amici curiae of Former Officials of U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agency filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 03 2019CIRCULATED
Sep 16 2019Record requested from the U.S.C.A. 5th Circuit.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Stephen I. Vladeck
    Counsel of Record
727 East Dean Keeton Street
Austin, TX 78705

svladeck@law.utexas.edu
5124759198
Party name: Jesus C. Hernández, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Randolph Joseph Ortega
    Counsel of Record
Ellis & Ortega
609 Myrtle Avenue
Suite 100
El Paso, TX 79901

randyortega@ellisandortega.com
915-542-1883
Party name: Jesus Mesa, Jr.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Kelsi Brown Corkran
    Counsel of Record
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
1152 15th Street NW
Washington, DC 20005

kcorkran@orrick.com
202-339-8497
Party name: Former Officials of U.S. Customs and Border Protection Agency
Ethan Douglas Dettmer
    Counsel of Record
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
555 Mission St., Suite 3000
San Francisco, CA 94105

edettmer@gibsondunn.com
(415) 393-8200
Party name: Border Scholars
Donald Francis Donovan
    Counsel of Record
Debevoise & Plimpton LLP
919 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

dfdonovan@debevoise.com
(212) 909-6000
Party name: Government of the United Mexican States
Stephen Andrew Fogdall
    Counsel of Record
Schnader Harrison Segal & Lewis LLP
1600 Market Street
Suite 3600
Philadelphia, PA 19103

sfogdall@schnader.com
215-751-2581
Party name: Border Network for Human Rights, San Diego Immigrant Rights Consortium, Southern Border Communities Coalition, and Texas Civil Rights Project
Robert Peller Frommer
    Counsel of Record
Institute for Justice
901 N. Glebe Road
Suite 900
Arlington, VA 22203

rfrommer@ij.org
7036829320
Party name: Institute for Justice
Brianne Jenna Gorod
    Counsel of Record
Constitutional Accountability Center
1200 18th Street, NW
Suite 501
Washington, DC 20036

brianne@theusconstitution.org
202 296 6889
Party name: Constitutional Accountability Center
Hyland Hunt
    Counsel of Record
Deutsch Hunt PLLC
300 New Jersey Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

hhunt@deutschhunt.com
2028686915
Party name: Carlos M. Vazquez and Anya Bernstein
Sharon Katz
    Counsel of Record
Davis Polk & Wardwell
450 Lexington Avenue
New York, NY 10017

sharon.katz@davispolk.com
212-450-4000
Party name: Tahirih Justice Center, et al.
David Sapir LesserWilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
7 World Trade Center
New York, NY 10007

David.Lesser@wilmerhale.com
2122308800
Party name: Professor Gregory C. Sisk
Sean Abram Lev
    Counsel of Record
Kellogg, Hansen, Todd, Figel & Frederick, P.L.L.C.
1615 M Street, NW, Suite 400
Washington, DC 20036

slev@kellogghansen.com
202 326 7000
Party name: Brady
Lena Fatina Masri
    Counsel of Record
Council on American Islamic Relations
453 New Jersey Avenue SE
Washington, DC 20003

lmasri@cair.com
2027426420
Party name: Council on American-Islamic Relations and Anas Elhady
Joshua Adam Matz
    Counsel of Record
Kaplan Hecker & Fink LLP
350 Fifth Avenue
Suite 7110
New York, NY 10118

jmatz@kaplanhecker.com
(212) 763-0883
Party name: Douglas Laycock, et al.
Hope R. Metcalf
    Counsel of Record
Allard K. Lowenstein International Human Rights Clinic
127 Wall Street
New Haven, CT 06511

hope.metcalf@yale.edu
203-432-9404
Party name: Amnesty International US et al.
Alan Michael Mygatt-Tauber
    Counsel of Record
Law Office of Alan Mygatt-Tauber
10089 Ashley Circle NW
Silverdale, WA 98383

alan@amtappeals.com
202-236-9734
Party name: Alan Mygatt-Tauber
Matthew Eben Price
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block, LLP
1099 New York Ave. NW, Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

MPrice@jenner.com
202-639-6000
Party name: Immigrant and Civil Rights Organizations
Ari Joseph Savitzky
    Counsel of Record
Wilmer Cutler Pickering Hale and Dorr LLP
1875 Pensylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20006

ari.savitzky@wilmerhale.com
202-663-6000
Party name: Professor Gregory C. Sisk
Cody Hirt Wofsy
    Counsel of Record
American Civil Liberties Union Foundation
39 Drumm St.
San Francisco, CA 94111

cwofsy@aclu.org
415-343-0785
Party name: American Civil Liberties Union, ACLU of San Diego & Imperial Counties, ACLU of Texas, ACLU of Arizona, and ACLU of New Mexico

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543