Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1618
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1618
Vide 17-1623
Title:Gerald Lynn Bostock, Petitioner
v.
Clayton County, Georgia
Docketed:June 1, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
   Case Numbers:(17-13801)
   Decision Date:May 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 25 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 2, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Gerald Lynn Bostock.
Blanket Consent
Jun 27 2018Waiver of right of respondent Clayton County, Georgia to respond filed.
Main Document
Jul 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 13 2018Response Requested. (Due August 13, 2018)
Aug 02 2018Supplemental brief of petitioner Gerald Lynn Bostock filed.
Main DocumentOtherCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 10 2018Brief of respondent Clayton County, Georgia in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 24 2018Reply of petitioner Gerald Lynn Bostock filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 29 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Sep 11 2018Rescheduled.
Nov 07 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 11/30/2018.
Nov 26 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 03 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/7/2018.
Dec 03 2018Rescheduled.
Dec 20 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/4/2019.
Jan 07 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/11/2019.
Jan 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 1/18/2019.
Feb 04 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/15/2019.
Feb 19 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 2/22/2019.
Feb 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/1/2019.
Mar 11 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/15/2019.
Mar 18 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/22/2019.
Mar 25 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019.
Apr 08 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/12/2019.
Apr 15 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/18/2019.
Apr 22 2019Petition GRANTED. The petition for writ of certiorari in No. 17-1623 is granted. The cases are consolidated and a total of one hour is allotted for oral argument. VIDED.
Apr 23 2019Because the Court has consolidated these cases for briefing and oral argument, future filings and activity in the cases will now be reflected on the docket of No. 17-1618. Subsequent filings in these cases must therefore be submitted through the electronic filing system in No. 17-1618. Each document submitted in connection with one or more of these cases must include on its cover the case number and caption for each case in which the filing is intended to be submitted. Where a filing is submitted in fewer than all of the cases, the docket entry will reflect the case number(s) in which the flings is submitted; a document filed in all of the consolidated cases will be noted as “VIDED.”
May 09 2019Briefing proposal from the parties in Nos. 17-1618, 17-1623, and 18-107 filed. VIDED.
Main Document
May 13 2019Petitioner in No. 17-1618, respondents in No. 17-1623, and respondent Aimee Stephens in No. 18-107 shall file their briefs on the merits, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(v), on or before Wednesday, June 26, 2019. Respondent in No. 17-1618, petitioners in No. 17-1623, and petitioner and respondent EEOC in No. 18-107 shall file their briefs on the merits, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(vi), on or before Friday, August 16, 2019. Reply briefs, if any, pursuant to Rule 33.1(g)(vii), shall be filed on or before Monday, September 16, 2019. Amicus curiae briefs shall be filed pursuant to Rule 37.3. VIDED.
May 22 2019Blanket Consent filed by Petitioner, Altitude Express, Inc., et al. (petitioners in 17-1623)
Blanket Consent
Jun 05 2019Letter from counsel for petitioner, respondents in 17-1623, and respondent Aimee Stephens in 18-107, regarding requests for consent to file amicus curiae briefs filed. VIDED.
Main Document

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Brian John Sutherland
    Counsel of Record
Buckley Beal, LLP
600 Peachtree Street NE
Suite 3900
Atlanta, GA 30308

bsutherland@buckleybeal.com
(404) 781-1100
Party name: Gerald Lynn Bostock
Saul D. Zabell
    Counsel of Record
Zabell & Associates, P.C.
1 Corporate Drive
Suite 103
Bohemia, NY 11716

szabell@laborlawsny.com
631-589-7242
Party name: Altitude Express, Inc., et al. (petitioners in 17-1623)
Attorneys for Respondent
Gregory Antollino
    Counsel of Record
Suite 904
588 Broadway
New York, NY 10012

gregory10011@icloud.com
212-334-7397
Party name: Melissa Zarda, et al. (respondents in 17-1623)
Jack R. Hancock
    Counsel of Record
Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP
661 Forest Parkway
Suite E
Forest Park, GA 30297

jhancock@fmglaw.com
470-322-1802
Party name: Clayton County, Georgia
Pamela Susan KarlanStanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
650-725-4851
Party name: Melissa Zarda et al. (respondents in 17-1623)

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543