SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1585
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1585
Title:
Piero A. Bugoni, Petitioner
v.
Taylor O'Brien, et al.
Docketed:
May 23, 2018
Lower Ct:
District Court of Appeal of Florida, Fourth District
Case Numbers:
(4D16-1788)
Decision Date:
December 21, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
January 29, 2018
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Apr 13 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 22, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 01 2018
Waiver of right of respondents Taylor O'Brien, et al. to respond filed.
Main Document
Jun 05 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Piero Bugoni
160 W. Camino Real
#191
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Party name: Piero A. Bugoni
Attorneys for Respondents
Richard C. McCrea Jr.
Counsel of Record
Greenberg Traurig, P.A.
101 E Kennedy Boulevard
Suite 1900
Tampa, FL 33602-0000
mccrear@gtlaw.com
8133185700
Party name: Taylor O'Brien, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##