May 17 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 18, 2018) |
| PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
May 30 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent Louisiana to respond filed. |
| Main Document |
Jun 04 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Louisiana Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers, et al. filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Jun 04 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of The Ethics Bureau at Yale filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 05 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018. |
| |
Jun 11 2018 | Response Requested. (Due July 11, 2018) |
| |
Jun 18 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of National Jury Project filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 21 2018 | Brief amicus curiae of Professor Jed Handelsman Shugerman filed. |
| Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count |
Jun 25 2018 | Brief amici curiae of Former State and Federal Trial Court Judges filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Jun 27 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response from July 11, 2018 to August 10, 2018, submitted to The Clerk. |
| Main Document |
Jun 29 2018 | Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including August 10, 2018. |
| |
Aug 10 2018 | Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Aug 27 2018 | Reply of petitioner Rogers Lacaze filed. |
| Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service |
Aug 29 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018. |
| |
Sep 18 2018 | Rescheduled. |
| |
Oct 01 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/5/2018. |
| |
Oct 09 2018 | Petition DENIED. |
| |