Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1498
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1498
Title:Atlantic Richfield Company, Petitioner
v.
Gregory A. Christian, et al.
Docketed:May 1, 2018
Linked with 17A872
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Montana
   Case Numbers:(OP 16-0555)
   Decision Date:December 29, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Feb 14 2018Application (17A872) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from March 29, 2018 to April 30, 2018, submitted to Justice Kennedy.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsProof of Service
Feb 20 2018Application (17A872) granted by Justice Kennedy extending the time to file until April 30, 2018.
Apr 27 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due May 31, 2018)
PetitionProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
May 14 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from May 31, 2018 to July 2, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
May 18 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including July 2, 2018.
May 30 2018Brief amici curiae of Treasure State Resources Association of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2018Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 31 2018Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jul 02 2018Brief of respondents Gregory A. Christian, et al. in opposition filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count
Jul 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/24/2018.
Jul 18 2018Reply of petitioner Atlantic Richfield Co. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 01 2018The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Apr 30 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
May 14 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/30/2019.
May 14 2019Supplemental brief of petitioner Atlantic Richfield Co. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 03 2019DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/6/2019.
Jun 10 2019Petition GRANTED.
Jun 17 2019Joint motion for an extension of time to file the briefs on the merits filed.
Main Document
Jun 27 2019Joint motion to extend the time to file the briefs on the merits granted. The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including August 21, 2019. The time to file respondents' brief on the merits is extended to and including October 15, 2019. The reply brief is to be filed in compliance with Rule 25.3.
Aug 21 2019Brief of petitioner Atlantic Richfield Co. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 21 2019Joint appendix filed.
Main DocumentProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word Count
Aug 28 2019Brief amicus curiae of Washington Legal Foundation filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Aug 28 2019Brief amici curiae of Treasure State Resources Association of Montana, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Sep 13 2019SET FOR ARGUMENT on Tuesday, December 3, 2019.
Sep 18 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument filed.
Proof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 15 2019Brief of respondents Gregory A. Christian, et al. filed.
Certificate of Word CountProof of ServiceMain Document
Oct 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Clark Fork Coalition and Montana Environmental Information Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Virginia, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2019Brief amici curiae of Pacific Legal Foundation and Property and Environment Research Center filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 22 2019Brief amicus curiae of Public Citizen, Inc. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Oct 23 2019Record requested from the Supreme Court of Montana.
Oct 24 2019The Record from the Supreme Court of Montana is electronic and can be found on their docket (No. OP 16-0555). Go to supremecourtdocket.mt.gov.
Oct 25 2019CIRCULATED
Nov 04 2019Motion of the Solicitor General for leave to participate in oral argument as amicus curiae and for divided argument GRANTED.
Nov 14 2019Reply of petitioner Atlantic Richfield Co. filed. (Distributed)
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Lisa Schiavo Blatt
    Counsel of Record
Williams & Connolly LLP
725 Twelfth Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005

lblatt@wc.com
202-434-5050
Party name: Atlantic Richfield Co.
Attorneys for Respondents
Joseph Russell Palmore
    Counsel of Record
Morrison & Foerster LLP
2000 Pennsylvania Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20006

jpalmore@mofo.com
202-887-6940
Party name: Gregory A. Christian, et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Kyle Anne Gray
    Counsel of Record
Holland & Hart LLP
401 N. 31st Street
Suite 1500
Billings, MT 59101

kgray@hollandhart.com
(406) 252-2166
Party name: Treasure State Resources Association of Montana, et al.
Aaron Michael Streett
    Counsel of Record
Baker Botts, L.L.P.
910 Louisiana Street
Houston, TX 77002

aaron.streett@bakerbotts.com
713-229-1234
Party name: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America, et al.
Cory L. AndrewsWashington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20036

candrews@wlf.org
(202) 588-0302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Corbin Knight Barthold
    Counsel of Record
Washington Legal Foundation
2009 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20036

cbarthold@wlf.org
2025880302
Party name: Washington Legal Foundation
Toby Jay Heytens
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
202 North Ninth Street
Richmond, VA 23219

SolicitorGeneral@oag.state.va.us
(804) 786-7240
Party name: Virginia, et al.
Caleb Adam Jaffe
    Counsel of Record
Environmental and Regulatory Law Clinic
University of Virginia School of Law
580 Massie Road
Charlottesville, VA 22903

cjaffe@law.virginia.edu
4349244776
Party name: Clark Fork Coalition and Montana Environmental Information Center
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Public Citizen, Inc.
Jonathan Calvin Wood
    Counsel of Record
Pacific Legal Foundation
3100 Clarendon Blvd., Suite 610
Arlington, VA 22201-5330

jwood@pacificlegal.org
(202) 888-6881
Party name: Pacific Legal Foundation and Property and Environment Research Center

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543