Docket for 17-147
|
Mar 13 2017 | Application (16A1232) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from June 26, 2017 to July 26, 2017, submitted to Justice Ginsburg. | | | Jun 16 2017 | Application (16A1232) granted by Justice Ginsburg extending the time to file until July 26, 2017. | | | Jul 26 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 28, 2017) | | | Aug 23 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 27, 2017. | | | Sep 27 2017 | Brief of respondents New York, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Oct 11 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|