Docket for 17-1454
|
Apr 18 2018 | Petition for a writ of mandamus filed. (Response due May 21, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | May 04 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents James Avery, Alan M. Miles, Ione S. George and M. Karlynn Haberly to respond filed. | | | May 11 2018 | Waiver of right of respondents Washington State Supreme Court Clerk Susan Carlson, et al. to respond filed. | | | May 29 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018. | | | Jun 18 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|