Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1368
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1368
Title:Joseph B. Scarnati, III, In His Capacity as Senate President Pro Tempore, Appellant
v.
Louis Agre, et al.
Docketed:March 29, 2018
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
   Case Numbers:(17-4392)
   Decision Date:January 10, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2018Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due April 30, 2018)
Jurisdictional StatementAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2018Brief amici curiae of The States of Texas, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 27 2018Motion to dismiss or affirm filed by appellees Louis Agre, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 30 2018Motion to dismiss filed by appellees Governor Thomas W. Wolf, et al.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 11 2018Reply of appellant Joseph B. Scarnati, III, in his capacity as Pennsylvania Senate President Pro Tempore filed.
Main DocumentProof of ServiceOther
May 15 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018.
May 24 2018Letter of May 25, 2018 from counsel for appellant with attached supplemental authority received. (Distributed) (This letter replaces counsel's letter of May 24, 2018)
Main DocumentProof of Service
Jun 04 2018Appeal dismissed for want of jurisdiction.
Jul 06 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Appellant
Jason Brett Torchinsky
    Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186

jtorchinsky@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Joseph B. Scarnati, III, in his capacity as Pennsylvania Senate President Pro Tempore
Attorneys for Appellees
Mark A. Aronchick
    Counsel of Record
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103

maronchick@hangley.com
215-568-6200
Party name: Governor Thomas W. Wolf, et al.
Lisa Ann Mathewson
    Counsel of Record
The Law Offices of Lisa A. Mathewson, LLC
123 S. Broad Street
Suite 810
Philadelphia, PA 19109

lam@mathewson-law.com
215-399-9592
Party name: Louis Agre, et al.
Other
Scott A. Keller
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
Solicitor General
P.O. Box 12548 (MC 059)
Austin, TX 78711-2548

scott.keller@oag.texas.gov
512-936-1700
Party name: The States of Texas, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543