Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1357
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1357
Title:Five Star Senior Living Inc., fka Five Star Quality Care, Inc., et al., Petitioners
v.
Melinda Mandviwala
Docketed:March 27, 2018
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-55084)
   Decision Date:February 2, 2018
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Mar 26 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 26, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 13 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 26, 2018 to May 22, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 17 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 22, 2018.
Apr 26 2018Brief amici curiae of The Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018Brief of respondent Melinda Mandviwala in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 01 2018Reply of petitioners Five Star Senior Living Inc. and FVE Managers, Inc. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Jun 05 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Clifford M. Sloan
    Counsel of Record
Skadden, Arps, Slate, Meagher & Flom LLP
1440 New York Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20005

cliff.sloan@skadden.com
202-371-7040
Party name: Five Star Senior Living Inc. and FVE Managers, Inc.
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott Lawrence Nelson
    Counsel of Record
Public Citizen Litigation Group
1600 20th Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20009

snelson@citizen.org
202-588-1000
Party name: Melinda Mandviwala
Other
Andrew John Pincus
    Counsel of Record
Mayer Brown LLP
1999 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20006

apincus@mayerbrown.com
202-263-3000
Party name: The Chamber of Commerce of the United States, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543