SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1339
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1339
Title:
Louis Agre, et al., Appellants
v.
Thomas W. Wolf, Governor of Pennsylvania, et al.
Docketed:
March 23, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States District Court for the Eastern District of Pennsylvania
Case Numbers:
(17-cv-4392)
Decision Date:
January 10, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 19 2018
Statement as to jurisdiction filed. (Response due April 23, 2018)
Jurisdictional Statement
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 23 2018
Motion to affirm filed by appellees Senator Joseph B. Scarnati III, President Pro Tempore of the Pennsylvania Senate; and Representative Michael Turzai, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 23 2018
Motion to dismiss filed by appellees Governor Thomas W. Wolf, Acting Secretary of the Commonwealth, et al.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 03 2018
Response to the motions to dismiss and affirm from appellants Louis Agre, et al. filed.
Main Document
Other
Other
Proof of Service
May 08 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018.
May 29 2018
The appeal is DISMISSED AS MOOT.
Jul 02 2018
JUDGMENT ISSUED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Appellants
Thomas H. Geoghegan
Counsel of Record
Despres, Schwartz & Geoghegan, Ltd.
77 W. Washington St.
Suite 711
Chicago, IL 60602
tgeoghegan@dsgchicago.com
3123722511
Party name: Louis Agre, et al.
Attorneys for Appellees
Mark A. Aronchick
Counsel of Record
Hangley Aronchick Segal Pudlin & Schiller
One Logan Square, 27th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19103
maa@hangley.com
215-568-6200
Party name: Governor Thomas W. Wolf, Acting Secretary of the Commonwealth, et al.
Jason Brett Torchinsky
Counsel of Record
Holtzman Vogel Josefiak Torchinsky PLLC
45 North Hill Dr., Suite 100
Warrenton, VA 20186
jt@hvjt.law
540 341 8808
Party name: Senator Joseph B. Scarnati III, President Pro Tempore of the Pennsylvania Senate; and Representative Michael Turzai, Speaker of the Pennsylvania House of Representatives
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##