SEARCH TIPS
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1274 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1274 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:
Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections, Petitioner
v.
Robert Allen Poyson
Docketed:
March 12, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(10-99005)
Decision Date:
January 12, 2018
Rehearing Denied:
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Mar 08 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 11, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 23 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 11, 2018 to May 11, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Mar 28 2018
Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 11, 2018
Apr 11 2018
Brief amicus curiae of Arizona Voice for Crime Victims filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Apr 11 2018
Brief amici curiae of States of Nevada, et al. filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 11 2018
Brief of respondent Robert Allen Poyson in opposition filed.
Main Document
Other
Proof of Service
May 11 2018
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent Robert Allen Poyson.
Main Document
Proof of Service
May 24 2018
Reply of petitioner Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 29 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 18 2018
Motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by respondent GRANTED.
Jun 18 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Dominic Emil Draye
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
2005 North Central Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85004
solicitorgeneral@azag.gov
602-542-3333
Party name: Charles L. Ryan, Director, Arizona Department of Corrections
Attorneys for Respondent
Jeffrey T. Green
Counsel of Record
Sidley Austin
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005
jgreen@sidley.com
202 736 8291
Party name: Robert Allen Poyson
Other
Colleen Clase
Counsel of Record
Arizona Voice for Crime Victims
111 East Taylor Street
Phoenix, AZ 85004
colleen.avcv@gmail.com
480-789-9951
Party name: Arizona Voice for Crime Victims
Lawrence J. C. Van Dyke
Counsel of Record
Nevada Attorney General's Office
100 North Carson Street
Carson City, NV 89701
lvandyke@ag.nv.gov
(775) 684-1100
Party name: States of Nevada, et al.
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##