Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-127
RSS Feed Print
No. 17-127
Title:Stephen V. Kolbe, et al., Petitioners
v.
Lawrence J. Hogan, Jr., Governor of Maryland, et al.
Docketed:July 26, 2017
Linked with 16A1074
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-1945)
   Decision Date:February 21, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 03 2017Application (16A1074) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from May 22, 2017 to July 21, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
May 10 2017Application (16A1074) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until July 21, 2017.
Jul 21 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due August 25, 2017)
Aug 10 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 10, 2017.
Aug 21 2017Brief amici curiae of Cato Institute, et al. filed.
Aug 23 2017Motion for leave to file amici brief filed by Edwin Vieira, Jr., et al.
Aug 23 2017Brief amici curiae of Pink Pistols, et al. filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amici curiae of Law Enforcement Groups, et al. filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of The National Rifle Association of America, Inc. filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amici curiae of State of West Virginia and 20 Other States filed.
Aug 25 2017Brief amicus curiae of Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence filed.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
John Parker Sweeney
    Counsel of Record
Bradley, Arant, Boult, Cummings, LLP
1615 L Street, N.W., Suite 1350
Washington, DC 20036

jsweeney@bradley..com
(202) 393-7150
Party name: Stephen V. Kolbe, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Matthew John Fader
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 St. Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202-2021

mfader@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-7906
Party name: Hogan, Gov. of MD, et al.
Other
Anthony Thomas Caso
    Counsel of Record
Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence c/o Fowler School of Law Chapman Univ.
One University Drive
Orange, CA 92866

caso@chapman.edu
877-855-3330
Party name: Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence
Charles Justin Cooper
    Counsel of Record
Cooper & Kirk, PLLC
1523 New Hampshire Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20036

ccooper@cooperkirk.com
202-220-9600
Party name: The National Rifle Association of America, Inc.
Thomas M. Johnson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
State Capitol Complex Building 1, Rm E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

tmj@wvago.gov
304-558-2021
Party name: State of West Virginia and 20 Other States
David Benjamin Kopel
    Counsel of Record
Independence Institute
727 East 16th Avenue
Denver, CO 80203

david@i2i.org
303 279-6536
Party name: Cato Institute, et al.
Brian Stuart Koukoutchos
    Counsel of Record
28 Eagle Trace
Mandeville, LA 70471

bkoukoutchos@gmail.com
985-626-5052
Party name: Pink Pistols, et al.
Robert Jeffrey Olson
    Counsel of Record
William J. Olson, P.C.
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al.
Dan Mark Peterson
    Counsel of Record
Dan M. Peterson, PLLC
3925 Chain Bridge Road
Suite 403
Fairfax, VA 22030

dan@danpetersonlaw.com
703-352-7276
Party name: Law Enforcement Groups, et al.
Edwin Vieira
    Counsel of Record
52 Stone Court
Front Royal, VA 22630

edwinvieira@gmail.com
540-636-9378
Party name: Edwin Vieira, Jr., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543