Docket for 17-1269
|
Mar 09 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 9, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Apr 09 2018 | Brief of respondent Republic of Sudan filed. | | Main DocumentProof of ServiceCertificate of Word Count | Apr 24 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/10/2018. | | | May 01 2018 | Rescheduled. | | | May 29 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018. | | | Jun 18 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018. | | | Mar 27 2019 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/29/2019. | | | Apr 01 2019 | Petition DENIED. Justice Kagan took no part in the consideration or decision of this petition. | | |
|