SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1211
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1211
Title:
Flanigan's Enterprises, Inc. of Georgia, et al., Petitioners
v.
City of Sandy Springs, Georgia
Docketed:
March 1, 2018
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-14428)
Decision Date:
August 14, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
November 27, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Feb 23 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due April 2, 2018)
Petition
Appendix
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Mar 20 2018
Waiver of right of respondent City of Sandy Springs, Georgia to respond filed.
Main Document
Mar 28 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018.
Apr 05 2018
Response Requested. (Due May 7, 2018)
May 07 2018
Brief of respondent City of Sandy Springs, Georgia in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
May 18 2018
Reply of petitioners Flanigan's Enterprises, Inc. of Georgia, et al. filed.
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
May 22 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 11 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
J. Michael Murray
Counsel of Record
Berkman, Gordon, Murray & DeVan
55 Public Square, Suite 2200
Cleveland, OH 44113
jmmurray@bgmdlaw.com
216-781-5245
Party name: Flanigan's Enterprises, Inc. of Georgia, et al.
Attorneys for Respondent
Scott D. Bergthold
Counsel of Record
Law Office of Scott D. Bergthold, P.L.L.C.
2290 Ogletree Ave., Ste. 106
Chattanooga, TN 37421
sbergthold@sdblawfirm.com
423-899-3025
Party name: City of Sandy Springs, Georgia
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##