Docket for 17-1126
|
Jan 18 2018 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 14, 2018) | | PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service | Mar 28 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 4/13/2018. | | | Apr 02 2018 | Waiver of right of respondent CVS Pharmacy to respond filed. | | | Apr 16 2018 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|