Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 17-1093 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 17-1093 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Rodney Reed, Petitioner
v.
Texas
Docketed:February 5, 2018
Linked with 17A639
Lower Ct:Court of Criminal Appeals of Texas
   Case Numbers:(AP-77,054)
   Decision Date:April 12, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:October 4, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Dec 12 2017Application (17A639) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from January 2, 2018 to February 1, 2018, submitted to Justice Alito.
Main DocumentLower Court Orders/OpinionsOtherProof of Service
Dec 14 2017Application (17A639) granted by Justice Alito extending the time to file until February 1, 2018.
Feb 01 2018Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due March 7, 2018)
PetitionAppendixCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 01 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from March 7, 2018 to April 6, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Mar 06 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including April 6, 2018
Mar 07 2018Brief amici curiae of 13 Retired Judges filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Mar 07 2018Brief amici curiae of Texas Exonerees Michael Morton, et al. filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
Apr 03 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response from April 6, 2018 to May 7, 2018, submitted to The Clerk.
Main Document
Apr 04 2018Motion to extend the time to file a response is granted and the time is extended to and including May 7, 2018
May 07 2018Brief of respondent Texas in opposition filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 18 2018Reply of petitioner Rodney Reed filed.
Main DocumentCertificate of Word CountProof of Service
May 22 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018.
Jun 05 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 11 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018.
Jun 13 2018Rescheduled.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Bryce Benjet
    Counsel of Record
The Innocence Project
40 Worth St., Ste. 701
New York , NY 10013

bbenjet@innocenceproject.org
2123645980
Party name: Rodney Reed
Attorneys for Respondent
Matthew Dennis Ottoway
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Attorney General
P.O. Box 12548
Capitol Station
Austin, TX 78711

matthew.ottoway@oag.texas.gov
512-463-7463
Party name: Texas
Other
Jessica Lynn Ellsworth
    Counsel of Record
Hogan Lovells US, LLP
555 13th Street, N. W.
Washington, DC 20004

jessica.ellsworth@hoganlovells.com
202-637-5886
Party name: 13 Retired Judges
Christian Romeyn Everdell
    Counsel of Record
Cohen & Gresser LLP
800 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022

ceverdell@cohengresser.com
212-957-7600
Party name: Texas Exonerees Michael Morton, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543