SEARCH TIPS
Search term too short
Invalid text in search term. Try again
ADVANCED SEARCH
DOCKET SEARCH
Search
Toggle navigation
OPINIONS
Opinions of the Court
Opinions Relating to Orders
In-Chambers Opinions
U. S. Reports
Online Sources Cited in Opinions
Media Files Cited in Opinions
Case Citation Finder
FILING & RULES
Electronic Filing
Rules and Guidance
Supreme Court Bar
ORAL ARGUMENTS
Argument Transcripts
Argument Audio
Calendars and Lists
Courtroom Seating
CASE DOCUMENTS
Docket Search
Orders of the Court
Orders by Circuit
Granted/Noted Cases List
Journal
NEWS MEDIA
Services for News Media
Press Releases
Media Advisories
Press Credentials
Speeches
A Reporter's Guide to Applications
Chief Justice's Year-End Reports on the Federal Judiciary
ABOUT THE COURT
Justices
Supreme Court at Work
Code of Conduct for Justices
History and Traditions
The Supreme Court Building
Visiting the Court
Activities for Students & Families
Exhibitions
Building Regulations
Frequently Asked Questions
Home
>
Search Results
Docket for 17-1060
Search documents in this case:
Search
No. 17-1060
Title:
United States, ex rel. Benjamin Carter, Petitioner
v.
Halliburton Co., et al.
Docketed:
January 29, 2018
Linked with 17A547
Lower Ct:
United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
Case Numbers:
(16-1262)
Decision Date:
July 31, 2017
Rehearing Denied:
August 28, 2017
Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented
Date
Proceedings and Orders
Nov 16 2017
Application (17A547) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from November 26, 2017 to January 25, 2018, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Main Document
Lower Court Orders/Opinions
Proof of Service
Nov 16 2017
Response to application from respondent Halliburton, Co., et al. filed.
Main Document
Nov 21 2017
Application (17A547) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until January 25, 2018.
Jan 25 2018
Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due February 28, 2018)
Petition
Petition
Petition
Petition
Jan 31 2018
Brief of respondents Halliburton Co., et al. in opposition filed.
Main Document
Certificate of Word Count
Proof of Service
Feb 12 2018
Reply of petitioner United States, ex rel. Benjamin Carter filed. (Distributed)
Main Document
Proof of Service
Certificate of Word Count
Feb 14 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 3/2/2018.
Mar 05 2018
The Solicitor General is invited to file a brief in this case expressing the views of the United States.
Apr 05 2018
Letter of counsel for Benjamin Carter to Clerk filed.
Main Document
May 22 2018
Brief amicus curiae of United States filed.
Proof of Service
Main Document
Jun 05 2018
DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 25 2018
Petition DENIED.
NAME
ADDRESS
PHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
David S. Stone
Counsel of Record
Stone & Magnanini LLP
100 Connell Dr
Suite 2200
Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922
dstone@stonemagnalaw.com
(973) 218-1111
Party name: United States, ex rel. Benjamin Carter
Attorneys for Respondents
John Patrick Elwood
Counsel of Record
Vinson & Elkins, LLP
2200 Pennsylvania Ave., N.W.
Suite 500 - West
Washington, DC 20037
jelwood@velaw.com
202-639-6518
Party name: Halliburton Co., et al.
Other
Noel J. Francisco
Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001
SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##
{1}
##LOC[OK]##
##LOC[Cancel]##