Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16A1203
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16A1203
Title:North Carolina, et al., Appellants
v.
Sandra Little Covington, et al.
Docketed:
Linked with 16-1023
Lower Ct:United States District Court for the Middle District of North Carolina
   Case Numbers:(1:15-cv-399)
   Decision Date:
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 06 2017Application (16A1203) for issuance of the judgment forthwith, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Jun 07 2017Response to application (16A1203) requested by The Chief Justice, due Tuesday, June 13, 2017, by 3 p.m. ET.
Jun 13 2017Response to application from Philip E. Berger, et al. filed.
Jun 13 2017Response to application from North Carolina, et al. filed.
Jun 14 2017Reply of Sandra Little Covington, et al. filed.
Jun 15 2017Application (16A1203) referred to the Court.
Jun 15 2017Application (16A1203) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioners
Paul D. Clement
    Counsel of Record
Kirkland & Ellis LLP
655 Fifteenth Street, N.W.
Washington, DC 20005

paul.clement@kirkland.com
(202) 879-5000
Party name: Philip E. Berger, et al.
Alexander McC. Peters
    Counsel of Record
Special Deputy Attorney General
Special Litigation Division of the
North Carolina Department of Justice
P.O. Box 629
Raleigh, NC 27602

apeters@ncdoj.gov
(919) 716-6900
Party name: North Carolina, et al.
Attorneys for Respondents
Jessica Ring Amunson
    Counsel of Record
Jenner & Block LLP
1099 New York Ave., NW
Suite 900
Washington, DC 20001

jamunson@jenner.com
(202) 639-6000
Party name: Sandra Little Covington, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543