Docket for 16A1202
|
Jun 06 2017 | Application (16A1202) for issuance of the judgment forthwith, submitted to The Chief Justice. | | | Jun 07 2017 | Response to application (16A1202) requested by The Chief Justice, due Tuesday, June 13, 2017, by 3 p.m. ET. | | | Jun 13 2017 | Response to application from Philip E. Berger, et al. filed. | | | Jun 13 2017 | Response to application from North Carolina, et al. filed. | | | Jun 14 2017 | Reply of Sandra Little Covington, et al. filed. | | | Jun 15 2017 | Application (16A1202) referred to the Court. | | | Jun 15 2017 | Application (16A1202) denied by the Court. | | |
|