Docket for 16-9611
|
Jun 12 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 19, 2017) | | | Jul 05 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Florida to respond filed. | | | Jul 20 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Aug 01 2017 | Response Requested. (Due August 31, 2017) | | | Aug 25 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including October 2, 2017. | | | Sep 29 2017 | Brief of respondent Florida in opposition filed. | | | Oct 09 2017 | Reply of petitioner Sammy L. Stinson filed. | | | Oct 12 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017. | | | Oct 30 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|