Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9587
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9587
Title:Aureliano Villarreal-Garcia, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 15, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-40884, 16-40887)
   Decision Date:April 11, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 13 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 17, 2017)
Jul 12 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 16, 2017.
Aug 16 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 23 2017Reply of petitioner Aureliano Villarreal-Garcia filed.
Aug 31 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rosales-Mireles v. United States, 585 U. S. ____ (2018), and for consideration of the question whether the case is moot.
Jul 30 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Scott A. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Assistant Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana, Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

scott_marting@fd.org
(713) 718-4600
Party name: Aureliano Villarreal-Garcia
Scott A. Martin
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Federal Public Defender
440 Louisiana Street, Suite 1350
Houston, TX 77002-1669

(713) 718-4600
Party name: Aureliano Villarreal-Garcia
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543