Jun 10 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due July 13, 2017) |
| |
Jul 13 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 14, 2017. |
| |
Aug 10 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 5, 2017. |
| |
Sep 07 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 11, 2017. |
| |
Sep 11 2017 | Brief of respondent Louisiana in opposition filed. |
| |
Sep 20 2017 | Reply of petitioner Jeffrey Clark filed. |
| |
Sep 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/13/2017. |
| |
Oct 02 2017 | Letter of October 2, 2017, from counsel for petitioner received. |
| |
May 14 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/17/2018. |
| |
May 21 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/24/2018. |
| |
May 29 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 5/31/2018. |
| |
Jun 04 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/7/2018. |
| |
Jun 11 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/14/2018. |
| |
Jun 18 2018 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018. |
| |
Jun 25 2018 | Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of McCoy v. Louisiana, 584 U. S. ____ (2018). |
| |
Jul 27 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. |
| |
Jul 27 2018 | MANDATE ISSUED. |
| |