Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9187
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9187
Title:Santiago Solano-Hernandez, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:May 17, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(15-41554, 15-41582)
   Decision Date:January 26, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 01 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 16, 2017)
May 25 2017Waiver of right of respondent United States to respond filed.
May 31 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 15, 2017.
Jun 07 2017Response Requested. (Due July 7, 2017)
Jun 28 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 7, 2017.
Aug 07 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Aug 24 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017.
Jun 18 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/21/2018.
Jun 27 2018DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 6/27/2018.
Jun 28 2018Motion to proceed in forma pauperis and petition for a writ of certiorari GRANTED. Judgment VACATED and case REMANDED for further consideration in light of Rosales-Mireles v. United States, 585 U. S. ____ (2018), and for consideration of the question whether the case is moot.
Jul 30 2018JUDGMENT ISSUED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Santiago Solano-Hernandez#12126-265
Federal Correctional Institution
P.O. Box 1000
Cumberland, MD 21501

Party name: Santiago Solano-Hernandez
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543