Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9132
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9132
Title:Dale Lambert, Petitioner
v.
Louisiana
Docketed:May 15, 2017
Lower Ct:Court of Appeal of Louisiana, Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(2015-KA-0886)
   Decision Date:January 20, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:February 17, 2017
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
May 10 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 14, 2017)
Jun 14 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Criminal Justice Reform Clinic.
Jun 29 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Oct 02 2017Motion for leave to file amicus brief filed by Criminal Justice Reform Clinic GRANTED.
Oct 02 2017Petition DENIED.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
G. Ben Cohen
    Counsel of Record
The Promise of Justice Initiative
636 Baronne Street
New Orleans, LA 70113

bcohen@thejusticecenter.org
(504) 529-5955
Party name: Dale Lambert
Other
Jeffrey Erwin EllisLewis & Clark Law School
10015 SW Terwilliger Blvd.
Portland, OR 97219

jeffreyerwinellis@gmail.com
503 768 6721
Party name: Criminal Justice Reform Clinic

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543