Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-9033 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-9033 *** CAPITAL CASE ***
Title:Mark James Asay, Petitioner
v.
Florida
Docketed:May 5, 2017
Linked with 17A191
Lower Ct:Supreme Court of Florida
   Case Numbers:(SC16-223, SC16-102, SC16-628)
   Decision Date:December 22, 2016
   Rehearing Denied:February 1, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 29 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari and motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed. (Response due June 5, 2017)
Jun 09 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including July 5, 2017.
Jul 03 2017Brief of respondent Florida, et al. in opposition filed.
Aug 15 2017Reply of petitioner Mark J. Asay filed.
Aug 16 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Mark J. Asay filed.
Aug 17 2017Application (17A191) for a stay of execution of sentence of death, submitted to Justice Thomas.
Aug 18 2017Response to application (17A191) from respondent Florida filed.
Aug 23 2017Supplemental brief of petitioner Mark J.Asay filed.
Aug 24 2017Application (17A191) referred to the Court.
Aug 24 2017Petition DENIED.
Aug 24 2017Application (17A191) denied by the Court.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Martin J. McClain
    Counsel of Record
McClain & McDermott, PA141 NE 30th Street
Wilton Manors, FL 33334

(305) 984-8344
Party name: Mark J.Asay
Martin J. McClain
    Counsel of Record
McClain & McDermott, P.A.
141 N.E. 30th Street
Wilton Manors, FL 33334

martymcclain@earthlink.net
(305) 984-8344
Party name: Mark James Asay
Attorneys for Respondent
Carolyn M. Snurkowski
    Counsel of Record
Associate Deputy Attorney General
Office of the Attorney General
Capital Appeals
The Capitol, PL-01
Tallahassee, FL 32399-1050

carolyn.snurkowski@myfloridalegal.com
(850) 414-3300
Party name: Florida, et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543