Docket for 16-492
|
Oct 11 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due November 14, 2016) | | | Oct 19 2016 | Waiver of right of respondent Eric M. Levin, et al. to respond filed. | | | Nov 02 2016 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of November 22, 2016. | | | Nov 07 2016 | Response Requested. (Due December 7, 2016) | | | Dec 02 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including December 14, 2016. | | | Dec 14 2016 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 14, 2017. | | | Feb 16 2017 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including February 28, 2017. | | | Feb 28 2017 | Brief of respondents Eric M. Levin, et al. in opposition filed. | | | Mar 14 2017 | Reply of petitioner PEM Entities LLC filed. | | | Mar 15 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of March 31, 2017. | | | Mar 27 2017 | Rescheduled. | | | Jun 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 22, 2017. | | | Jun 26 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of June 26, 2017. | | | Jun 27 2017 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Jul 21 2017 | Motion to confirm party status of Province Grande Olde Liberty, LLC filed by petitioners and counsel for Province Grande Olde Liberty, LLC. | | | Jul 24 2017 | Responses or objections to the motion to confirm party status shall be filed with this Court and served upon counsel on or before August 4, 2017. | | | Jul 27 2017 | The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including September 11, 2017. | | | Aug 10 2017 | The petition for a writ of certiorari is DISMISSED as improvidently granted. | | | Aug 10 2017 | Joint motion to confirm party status of PEM Entities LLC and Province Grande Olde Liberty, LLC is DISMISSED as moot. | | | Oct 25 2017 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|