Docket for 16-424
|
Sep 30 2016 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due October 31, 2016) | | | Oct 27 2016 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including November 30, 2016. | | | Nov 16 2016 | Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including December 20, 2016. | | | Dec 20 2016 | Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed. | | | Jan 03 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of January 19, 2017. | | | Jan 03 2017 | Reply of petitioner Rodney Class filed. (Distributed) | | | Feb 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of February 17, 2017. | | | Feb 21 2017 | Petition GRANTED. | | | Mar 15 2017 | The time to file the joint appendix and petitioner's brief on the merits is extended to and including May 12, 2017. | | | Mar 15 2017 | The time to file respondent's brief on the merits is extended to and including July 17, 2017. | | | May 12 2017 | Joint appendix filed. (Statement of costs received.) | | | May 12 2017 | Brief of petitioner Rodney Class filed. | | | May 12 2017 | Consent to the filing of amicus curiae briefs in support of either party or of neither party from counsel for the petitioner. | | | May 19 2017 | Brief amici curiae of The National Association of Criminal Lawyers, et al. filed. | | | May 19 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of Albert W. Alschuler filed. | | | May 19 2017 | Brief amicus curiae of The Innocence Project filed. | | | Jul 17 2017 | Brief of respondent United States filed. | | | Jul 19 2017 | SET FOR ARGUMENT on Wednesday, October 4, 2017. | | | Aug 01 2017 | Record requested from the U.S.C.A. District of Columbia Circuit. | | | Aug 09 2017 | CIRCULATED | | | Aug 16 2017 | Reply of petitioner Rodney Class filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 04 2017 | Argued. For petitioner: Jessica R. Amunson, Washington, D. C. For respondent: Eric J. Feigin, Assistant to the Solicitor General, Department of Justice, Washington, D. C. | | | Feb 21 2018 | Judgment REVERSED and case REMANDED. Breyer, J., delivered the opinion of the Court, in which Roberts, C. J., and Ginsburg, Sotomayor, Kagan, and Gorsuch, JJ., joined. Alito, J., filed a dissenting opinion, in which Kennedy and Thomas, JJ., joined. | | | Mar 26 2018 | JUDGMENT ISSUED. | | |
|