Docket for 16-1547
|
Jun 23 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2017) | | | Jul 10 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Joseph Norman, Jr. to respond filed. | | | Jul 26 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Aug 01 2017 | Response Requested. (Due August 31, 2017) | | | Aug 23 2017 | Brief of respondent Joseph Norman, Jr. in opposition filed. | | | Sep 06 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 9/25/2017. | | | Sep 07 2017 | Reply of petitioner Maryland filed. (Distributed) | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|