Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1532
RSS Feed Print
No. 16-1532
Title:Shaquille Montel Robinson, Petitioner
v.
United States
Docketed:June 22, 2017
Linked with 16A969
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(14-4902)
   Decision Date:January 23, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Apr 07 2017Application (16A969) to extend the time to file a petition for a writ of certiorari from April 23, 2017 to June 22, 2017, submitted to The Chief Justice.
Apr 18 2017Application (16A969) granted by The Chief Justice extending the time to file until June 22, 2017.
Jun 22 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 24, 2017)
Jul 20 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including August 23, 2017.
Jul 24 2017Brief amicus curiae of National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers filed.
Jul 24 2017Brief amici curiae of States of West Virginia, et al. filed.
Jul 24 2017Brief amici curiae of Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al. filed.
Aug 10 2017Order further extending time to file response to petition to and including September 19, 2017.
Sep 19 2017Brief of respondent United States in opposition filed.
Oct 02 2017Reply of petitioner Shaquille M. Robinson filed.
Oct 04 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/27/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Pamela Susan Karlan
    Counsel of Record
Stanford Law School Supreme Court Litigation Clinic
559 Nathan Abbott Way
Stanford, CA 94305

karlan@stanford.edu
(650) 725-4851
Party name: Shaquille M. Robinson
Attorneys for Respondent
Noel J. Francisco
    Counsel of Record
Solicitor General
United States Department of Justice
950 Pennsylvania Avenue, NW
Washington, DC 20530-0001

SupremeCtBriefs@USDOJ.gov
202-514-2217
Party name: United States
Other
Thomas M. Johnson Jr.
    Counsel of Record
Office of the West Virgina Attorney General
State Capitol, Building 1, Rm E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

thomas.m.johnsonjr@wvago.gov
304-558-2021
Party name: States of West Virgina, et al.
Elbert LinSolicitor General
Office of Attorney General
State Capitol
Building 1, Room E-26
Charleston, WV 25305

Elbert.Lin@wvago.gov
(304) 558-2021
Party name: States of West Virginia, et al.
C. Kevin MarshallJones Day
51 Louisiana Avenue, N.W.
Washington, DC 20001

ckmarshall@jonesday.com
(202) 879-3939
Party name: National Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers
Robert Jeffrey OlsonWilliam J. Olson PC
370 Maple Avenue West, Suite 4
Vienna, VA 22180-5615

wjo@mindspring.com
703-356-5070
Party name: Gun Owners of America, Inc., et al.

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543