Supreme Court of the United States
Skip Navigation LinksHome > Search Results



Docket for 16-1517
RSS Feed Print
Search documents in this case:
No. 16-1517
Title:James Hamilton, Petitioner
v.
William L. Pallozzi, et al.
Docketed:June 20, 2017
Lower Ct:United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit
   Case Numbers:(16-1222)
   Decision Date:February 17, 2017
   Rehearing Denied:March 17, 2017
  Discretionary Court Decision Date:
Analyst:
Questions Presented

DateProceedings and Orders
Jun 15 2017Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 20, 2017)
Jul 05 2017Waiver of right of respondents William L. Pallozzi, et al. to respond filed.
Jul 19 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017.
Jul 20 2017Response Requested. (Due August 21, 2017)
Jul 20 2017Brief amicus curiae of Cato Institute filed.
Aug 04 2017Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 20, 2017.
Sep 20 2017Brief of respondents William L. Pallozzi, et al. in opposition filed.
Oct 03 2017Reply of petitioner James Hamilton filed.
Nov 14 2017DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 12/1/2017.

NAMEADDRESSPHONE
Attorneys for Petitioner
Alan Gura
    Counsel of Record
Gura, PLLC
916 Prince Street
Suite 107
Alexandria, VA 22314

alan@gurapllc.com
(703) 835-9085
Party name: James Hamilton
Attorneys for Respondents
Julia Doyle Bernhardt
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General
200 Saint Paul Place, 20th Floor
Baltimore, MD 21202

jbernhardt@oag.state.md.us
(410) 576-7291
Party name: William L. Pallozzi, et al.
Mark Holdsworth Bowen
    Counsel of Record
Office of the Attorney General of Maryland
1201 Reisterstown Road
Pikesville, MD 21208

mark.bowen@maryland.gov
(410)-653-4228
Party name: William L. Pallozzi, et al.
Other
Ilya ShapiroCato Institute
1000 Massachusetts Ave., NW
Washington, DC 20001

ishapiro@cato.org
(202) 842-2000
Party name: Cato Institute

 

SUPREME COURT OF THE UNITED STATES 1 First Street, NE Washington, DC 20543