Docket for 16-1484
|
May 09 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due July 13, 2017) | | | Jun 14 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent City of Cleveland, Ohio to respond filed. | | | Jun 28 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Oct 02 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|