Docket for 16-1372
|
May 09 2017 | Petition for a writ of certiorari filed. (Response due June 15, 2017) | | | Jun 12 2017 | Waiver of right of respondent Andy Beshear, Attorney General of Kentucky to respond filed. | | | Jun 21 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of September 25, 2017. | | | Jul 05 2017 | Response Requested. (Due August 4, 2017) | | | Jul 20 2017 | Order extending time to file response to petition to and including September 1, 2017. | | | Aug 30 2017 | Brief of respondent Andy Beshear, Attorney General of Kentucky in opposition filed. | | | Sep 08 2017 | Reply of petitioner ABC, Inc., aka American National University of Kentucky, Inc., fka National College of Kentucky, Inc. filed. | | | Sep 13 2017 | DISTRIBUTED for Conference of 10/6/2017. | | | Oct 10 2017 | Petition DENIED. | | |
|